U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event]
  • March 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 03, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.