U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dari
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 05, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 03, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.