U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bryant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • June 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 19, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 19, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 13, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.