U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ridley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 28, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 20, 2022: [USCA Order]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
  • November 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 10, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.