U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smallwood et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 12, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 04, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Sentencing ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 19, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • December 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 29, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 03, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • October 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • October 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 05, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 02, 2022: [Release Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 07, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • July 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 05, 2022: [Release Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 06, 2022: [Release Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • March 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.