U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Greene
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 08, 2022: [USCA Order]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 16, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Correction]
  • March 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 22, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 20, 2022: [Order]
  • March 20, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 20, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • March 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 04, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • March 04, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.