U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MANLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Garnishment]
  • December 22, 2022: [Garnishment]
  • December 14, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Quash ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • November 29, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • November 15, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice to Defendant Debtor]
  • November 07, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 24, 2022: [Application for Writ by USA]
  • August 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 04, 2022: [Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Transmission of Update Item to USCA]
  • July 06, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • June 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • June 29, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (Not Sealed)]
  • June 10, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 07, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 12, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 07, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.