U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • April 01, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 27, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 19, 2025: [Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence]
  • March 19, 2025: [Indictment]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.