U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patel et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Seal Document]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Judgment - Reason for Amendment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • September 21, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 19, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • September 16, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • September 13, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • September 13, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Seal]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 29, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 29, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • August 29, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 16, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 09, 2022: [Memorandum]
  • June 09, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 25, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • May 25, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 24, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • March 28, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 23, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 23, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice - Out of State Counsel]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 09, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 08, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 08, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.