U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03096
  • Case Name: Massey v. Funderburk et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 01, 2022: [Opinion from USCA]
  • August 01, 2022: [USCA Order]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 08, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • July 08, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 02, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 02, 2022: [Compel]
  • June 02, 2022: [Discovery]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 10, 2022: [Compel]
  • May 10, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 06, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 06, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 14, 2022: [Complaint]
  • March 14, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.