U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cunningham
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 17, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Sent]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Rule 5 Bond Release]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 14, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • March 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.