U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pena Lopez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • May 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 18, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 18, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 18, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 18, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • March 16, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • March 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 14, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 14, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.