U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Owens
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Seal ]
  • April 19, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 30, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 22, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Complaint ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.