U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01246-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Monroy
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 23, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.