U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01244-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whitington
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 14, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Document]
  • March 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 17, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • March 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.