U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oliver
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 29, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 17, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.