U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 28, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 21, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.