U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01262-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peters
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 23, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 17, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.