U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01261-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baze
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Waiver-Other]
  • January 19, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 23, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 17, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.