U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02054
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Competency Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice-other]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 04, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Respondent's Mental Health Examiner]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 17, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 17, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 17, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • March 17, 2022: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.