U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02053
  • Case Name: Hargett v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • June 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 22, 2022: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • June 22, 2022: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • June 22, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 28, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • April 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 13, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2254]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
  • April 06, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 06, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 17, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.