U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01264-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huerta-Esquivel
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 25, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 24, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 23, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.