U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03097
  • Case Name: Butler v. United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [USCA Order]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 25, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • August 22, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 01, 2022: [Reconsideration]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Memorandum & Opinion]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.