U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01270-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vatoci
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • December 31, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • December 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 31, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 18, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.