U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01274-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pagan
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • August 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
June, 2022
  • June 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 02, 2022: [Document]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • April 20, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 07, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • March 21, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.