U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03102
  • Case Name: Spence v. Pender Correction Institution Medical
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 08, 2022: [Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 08, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.