U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03101
  • Case Name: Hamilton v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • September 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 02, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 08, 2022: [Document]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
  • May 23, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • May 10, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 10, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 10, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 04, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • March 31, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • March 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.