U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03103
  • Case Name: Ballard v. Royal et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 03, 2023: [Request for Waiver of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 26, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 22, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 22, 2022: [Complaint]
  • March 22, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.