U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02055
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Haynesworth
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • September 22, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • September 06, 2022: [Remark]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Status Report]
  • August 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 01, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Text Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2022: [Motion No Longer Submitted]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Respondent's Mental Health Examiner]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 22, 2022: [Stay]
  • March 22, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 22, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • March 22, 2022: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.