U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03104
  • Case Name: Starke v. Weatherly et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Mail Returned]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 13, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 13, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 23, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • March 23, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.