U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03106
  • Case Name: Meyers v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 01, 2022: [Set Aside Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 19, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Case Submitted]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.