U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03105
  • Case Name: Oliver v. Wake County Sheriff's Office et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Letter]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 17, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • January 17, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 17, 2023: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 17, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 08, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • November 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Summons Reissued]
  • September 13, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Response]
  • September 02, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 25, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • March 23, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • March 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 23, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • March 23, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • March 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.