U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03108
  • Case Name: Hamilton v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 09, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 06, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 06, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 12, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 11, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.