U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03110
  • Case Name: James v. Ishee et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 11, 2022: [Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 24, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • March 24, 2022: [Complaint]
  • March 24, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.