U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01296-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Von Roishmandt
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 21, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • May 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 15, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.