U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01295-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mattern
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • September 12, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 15, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.