U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01294-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Love
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 24, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.