U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burgess
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Oral Order]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 24, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.