U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henry
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • May 16, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 08, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 24, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.