U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01291-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chestnutt
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Probation]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Probation]
  • September 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Probation]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Motion for Revocation of Probation]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.