U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01290-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Belcher
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 21, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Mail Returned]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 24, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.