U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01289-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bain
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 14, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 24, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.