U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fridell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Probation]
  • August 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Motion Referred]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 11, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 11, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 08, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • March 24, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.