U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02057
  • Case Name: Altman v. North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • October 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 14, 2022: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • October 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 14, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • September 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 08, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 03, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • August 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2254]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Response to Order]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
  • May 06, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 26, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 26, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.