U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02056
  • Case Name: Williams v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Document]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Document]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Document]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Document]
  • September 12, 2022: [Document]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Document]
  • July 25, 2022: [Document]
  • July 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 08, 2022: [Document]
  • April 06, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 06, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 06, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 06, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.