U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03080
  • Case Name: Curry v. Jackson, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • October 04, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 04, 2024: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 25, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 06, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 06, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • March 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.