U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01278-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnston
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Probation]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Probation]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Probation]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Probation]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 05, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 05, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Document]
  • April 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Show Cause Hearing ]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • April 06, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 06, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 25, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.