U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01277-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gough
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 11, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • March 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.