U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02058
  • Case Name: Roy v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 26, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • April 20, 2022: [Case Submitted]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.