U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03112
  • Case Name: McDuffie v. Wade et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Document]
  • January 06, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • December 19, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Declaration]
  • December 19, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • December 19, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • December 19, 2022: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 19, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 20, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • October 18, 2022: [Remark]
  • October 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 12, 2022: [Response]
  • August 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 27, 2022: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • July 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 26, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2022: [Text Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 10, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 03, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 27, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 27, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 14, 2022: [Document]
  • April 14, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 13, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 13, 2022: [Document]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 25, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • March 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.